HI HB1689 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 258, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1367).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 258, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1367).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an organic foods production tax credit applicable to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2016. Sunsets 12/31/2021. (CD1)
Title
Food Production Tax Credit
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Act 258, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1367). |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Act 258, 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1367). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Onishi, Tsuji, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Jordan voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott, Souki excused (2). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 102-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 102-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Luke, Cullen, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday, 04-27-16 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 225. |
2016-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 9:05AM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-25-16 9:30AM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, Pouha. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Slom. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 524) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3544) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye, Slom. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-16 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3067) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Gabbard, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kidani, Slom. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-16 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 206). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 958-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Tokioka; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-02-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 517-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-09 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-09-16 8:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |