HI HB17 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Act 120, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1220).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Act 120, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1220).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes the "one gallon per person per day" exception to the prohibition against the removal of sand and other beach or marine deposits, except for materials inadvertently taken, and creates an exemption for public emergencies and traditional cultural practices. Ensures public lateral access along the shoreline by making permanent the requirement that landowners remove human-induced, enhanced, or unmaintained vegetation interfering with such access and maintaining DLNR's enforcement duty to maintain such access. Clarifies that Act 160, SLH 2010 does not alter or modify any agreement of the DLNR existing or executed on the effective date of Act 160. Effective 06/29/13. (SD2)
Title
Coastal Areas; Public Access
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Denny Coffman [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Senate | Act 120, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1220). |
2013-06-18 | House | Act 120, on 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1220). |
2013-05-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 760). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with Representative(s) Fale, Jordan, Tsuji voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla, Morikawa, Oshiro, Tokioka voting no (4) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-26 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Rhoads, Kawakami, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 11:00AM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-13 11:00AM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 717). |
2013-04-22 | House | House conferees appointed: Evans, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Kawakami, Cheape. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Solomon, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 463) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1332) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1024) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Dela Cruz, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ruderman. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDL. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 156). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 758) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-19 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kawakami, Wooley. |
2013-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-19-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-30 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-01-30 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 5), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-01-25 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, C. Lee. |
2013-01-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 01-25-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |