HI HB1766 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to the Department of Agriculture to support agriculture in the State. Authorizes any moneys appropriated to be transferred to the Supplemental Appropriations Act of 2020. Effective 7/1/2150. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 479-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, Onishi, Perruso, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-20 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2020-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-20. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-07-20 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2020-02-03 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-05-20 8:35AM in conference room 312. |
2020-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-05-20 8:35AM in House conference room 312. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2157 (Same As) 2020-02-06 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.