HI HB18 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB18
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Insurance Commissioner to set the maximum wholesale prices of common prescription drugs based upon Canadian price regulations. Prohibits drug makers and distributors from removing prescription drugs from Hawaii markets. Prohibits various health plans and pharmacies from purchasing prescription drugs in excess of the maximum wholesale price.
Title
Related To Prescription Drug Costs.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB604 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB18 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB18 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=18&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB18_.HTM |