HI HB1805 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for the interest earned on payments under protest in the litigated claims fund to be paid in nontaxation cases if the claimant prevails. Establishes a procedure for the disposition of moneys and refiling of actions when a payment under protest suit is filed prematurely. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Procedure For Payment Under Protest Lawsuits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3175) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-24 9:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 17). |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Holt excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 716-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-22 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Nishimoto, Poepoe. |
2024-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-24 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-12 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 262-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-06 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-06-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |