HI HB1846 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Act 024, 4/17/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1124).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Act 024, 4/17/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1124).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the maximum claim amount that determines district court jurisdiction in civil cases from $25,000 to $40,000.
Title
District Court; Jurisdiction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Senate | Act 024, 4/17/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1124). |
2014-04-22 | House | Act 024, on 4/17/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1124). |
2014-04-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-04-04 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 493). |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-14. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3247) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 26). |
2014-02-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1). |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 176-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-01-30 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Creagan, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2014-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-30-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1846&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1846_.HTM |