HI HB1868 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-3)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Lowers the age a person may claim an exemption from jury duty from eighty years of age or older to seventy-seven years of age or older. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Jury Duty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
2020-02-13HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 378-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-07HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Say.
2020-02-05HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-07-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2020-02-05HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-20 at 2:00PM.
2020-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-05-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-23HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2338 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback