HI HB1873 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-4)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - The committee(s) on HLT/HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an outreach program in the department of health to inform physicians and appropriate non-physician practitioners participating in medicare that comprehensive care planning services for those with Alzheimer's disease and related dementias is a covered benefit under medicare.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Alzheimer's Disease.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06HouseThe committee(s) on HLT/HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2020-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HSH on Thursday, 02-06-20 8:40AM in House conference room 329.
2020-01-23HouseReferred to HLT/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 3
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2340 (Same As) 2020-02-28 - 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback