HI HB1904 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred to HRE, CPH/JDC.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred to HRE, CPH/JDC.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes The Uniform Employee and Student Online Privacy Protection Act that adopts uniform laws on protecting the online accounts of employees, prospective employees, unpaid interns, applicants, students, and prospective students from employers and educational institutions. Takes effect 1/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To The Uniform Employee And Student Online Privacy Protection Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HRE, CPH/JDC. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 302). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Eli excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 993-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-26 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Nakashima, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Yamane. |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-20 at 2:00pm. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) DeCoite voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 577-20), recommending referral to JUD. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Quinlan, Johanson, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, D. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Wednesday, 02-12-20 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-02-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 24-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LHE. |
2020-01-28 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Matsumoto. |
2020-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-28-20 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to LAB, LHE, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2010 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3).