HI HB192 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Act 101, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Act 101, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the law on planned community associations to apply to certain homeowners' associations. Clarifies that if a proxy is a standard proxy form authorized by an association, and the proxy is returned with no box checked or more than one box checked, the proxy shall be counted for quorum purposes only. (HB192 CD1)
Title
Relating To Homeowners' Associations.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | Act 101, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202). |
2017-07-07 | House | Act 101, on 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 9). |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 9) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2017-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Ohno, San Buenaventura Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2017-04-17 | House | Re-referred to CPC, IAC, JUD, referral sheet 45 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 398). |
2017-04-04 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-03 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 403) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ruderman, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-03-17. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1261) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 233). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 990) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-24-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 572) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Ito, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Todd. |
2017-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-13 | House | Re-referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 17 |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |