HI HB1981 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that a portion of the revenues collected from traffic violations shall be disbursed to the county that enforced the violation. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Traffic Violations.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Micah Aiu [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] |
Rep. Darius Kila [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 378-24), recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-02-07 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-07-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kapela, Nakashima excused (4). |
2024-02-05 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 42-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-02-01 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 02-01-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |