HI HB1998 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist Saint Joseph School in planning, designing, constructing, reconstructing, renovating, acquiring, equipping, and improving educational facilities.
Title
Relating To The Issuance Of Special Purpose Revenue Bonds To Assist Saint Joseph School.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3280 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Act 199, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1300).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1998&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1998_.HTM |