HI HB2000 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the Natural Energy Laboratory of Hawaii Authority's duties include supporting aquaculture.
Title
Relating To The Natural Energy Laboratory Of Hawaii Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2767 (Same As) 2024-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2000&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2000_.HTM |