HI SB2767 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the Natural Energy Laboratory of Hawaii Authority's duties include supporting aquaculture. Takes effect 1/1/2060. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Natural Energy Laboratory Of Hawaii Authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from EET/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2161) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-24 1:01PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/AEN, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2000 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2