HI HB2027 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - (S) Act 039, 4/20/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 497).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - (S) Act 039, 4/20/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 497).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that payees or holders in due course may assess a service charge up to $30 for a dishonored check. (SD1)
Title
Service Charges for Dishonored Checks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | (S) Act 039, 4/20/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 497). | |
2010-04-20 | (H) Act 039, on 4/20/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 251). | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 466). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting no (0) and Aquino, Hanohano, Har, M. Oshiro, Thielen excused (5). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 460). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 03-23-10. | |
2010-03-24 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 276). | |
2010-03-23 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2010-03-22 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 353) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-22 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Hee, Tsutsui). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-22-10. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-03-19 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2825) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Green, Ihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Sakamoto. | |
2010-03-08 | (S) The committee on CPN will reconsider its previous decision on HB2027 and will hold a public decision making on 03-12-10 9:55AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-03-05 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Sakamoto, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-05-10 9:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 8). | |
2010-02-03 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-01 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Sagum, Wooley excused (3). | |
2010-02-01 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 22-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Wakai, Belatti, Cabanilla, Ito, Karamatsu, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Morita, Thielen. | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 01-25-10 2:00 PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to CPC, referral sheet 2 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |