HI HB2122 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a private roads task force to identify and facilitate the repair and transfer of certain private or disputed roads to the appropriate government agency.
Title
Relating To Transportation.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Elle Cochran [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] |
Rep. Trish La Chica [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Tyson Miyake [D] |
Rep. Kanani Souza [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Tuesday, 02-13-24 11:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2122&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2122_.HTM |