HI HB2131 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on July 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-06 - Act 113, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1214).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on July 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-06 - Act 113, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1214).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a Hawaii Sexual Assault Response and Training Program to address the manner in which sexual assault evidence collection kits are processed and tracked, and to ensure that victims of sexual assault are informed of their rights under the law. Requires annual reports by the Attorney General to the President of the Senate and Speaker of the House. Appropriates funds. (HB2131 CD1)
Title
Relating To Sexual Assault.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-06 | Senate | Act 113, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1214). |
2018-07-06 | House | Act 113, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1214). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 132-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 132-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Keith-Agaran, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Cullen, Ichiyama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 1:30PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 1:30PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-24-18 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; L. Thielen. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto, Cullen Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Thielen. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 673) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3693) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kidani. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3038) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-18 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to JDC/PSM, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 190). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 976-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 744-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-15 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2018-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-15-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2345 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
AG
Appropriation ($)
DNA Testing
Evidence
Hawaii Sexual Assault Response and Training Program
Sexual Assault
Appropriation ($)
DNA Testing
Evidence
Hawaii Sexual Assault Response and Training Program
Sexual Assault