HI HB2145 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that clean, naturally occurring beach sand moved from a beach, stream mouth, or channel to an adjoining beach or littoral cell for purposes of sediment or erosion control or for ecosystem restoration is not a water pollutant for purposes of Department of Health water quality permits. (HB2145 HD2)
Title
Beach Restoration; Water Pollutant; Sand
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 621-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to JUD. |
2016-02-16 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-16-16 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1). |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 116-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP. |
2016-02-03 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-03-16 10:15AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to OMH, EEP, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2245 (Same As) 2016-03-24 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).