HI HB2152 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 658).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 658).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the disability and communication access board to charge a fee to defray expenses of review of construction plans to ensure compliance with laws relating to access to persons with disabilities. Establishes temporary fees until the board adopts permanent fees. Requires report to the legislature. (SD1)
Title
Persons with Disabilities; Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 658). | |
2010-07-06 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 420). | |
2010-06-21 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-10 (Gov. Msg. No. 627) | |
2010-06-21 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 388) | |
2010-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 631). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 626). | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-07-10 | |
2010-04-16 | (H) The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-15 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-16-10 10:25AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 558). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Finnegan. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 573). | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Ige, Chair; Tsutsui, Co-Chair(s); Chun Oakland. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 462). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 430) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) One Day Notice 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3004) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-10 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-03-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-18 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2768) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-03-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has rescheduled its public hearing to 03-10-10 2:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-10 2:25PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to HTH, WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 86). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 600-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Ward. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-22-10 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Magaoay, Sagum excused (3). | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 185-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Belatti, Bertram, Brower, Carroll, Mizuno, Shimabukuro, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-01-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 01-29-10 9:30 AM in House conference room 329. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2267 (Same As) 2010-03-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative Marumoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Finnegan, Manahan, M. Oshiro excused (4).