HI HB2162 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 1:00PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 1:00PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that funds for bonuses required by statute or collective bargaining shall not be paid out of a charter school's facilities funding or per-pupil funds. Beginning with fiscal year 2018-2019, requires that such bonuses be separate line items in the budget. Appropriates funds for teacher bonuses for hard-to-fill placement incentives and National Board certified teacher incentives for charter school teachers. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Teacher Incentives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 1:00PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 2:15PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 2:45PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 827). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; K. Kahele Co-Chair; Espero. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Johanson, Todd Co-Chairs; Keohokalole, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 676) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3703) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3022) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Dela Cruz. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-18 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to EDU/LBR, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 78). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 847-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6). |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from EDN/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 520-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, McKelvey. |
2018-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN/LAB on Friday, 02-02-18 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to EDN/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |