HI HB2200 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 007, 07/15/2020, (Gov. Msg. No. 1108).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 007, 07/15/2020, (Gov. Msg. No. 1108).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adjusts and makes additional appropriations for fiscal biennium 2019-2021 to fund the operations of executive branch agencies and programs. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The State Budget.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 007, 07/15/2020, (Gov. Msg. No. 1108). |
2020-07-14 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 007, 07/07/2020, (Gov. Msg. No. 1108). |
2020-05-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 361). |
2020-05-21 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-05-21 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Received notice of House intent to agree (Hse. Com. No. 360) |
2020-05-18 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 530) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) L. Thielen). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on Passage of Third Reading. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 05-18-20. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3512) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Shimabukuro. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 05-13-20 10:30AM in conference room Auditorium. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 05-11-20 10:30AM in conference room Auditorium. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 9). |
2020-02-18 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Lowen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 677-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-20 2:15PM in conference room 308. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2075 (Same As) 2020-01-17 - Referred to WAM.