HI HB2244 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations to fund and support various housing programs. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Housing Omnibus; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | The conference committee deferred the measure. |
2016-04-28 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-29-16 10:10AM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Harimoto Chair; Chun Oakland, Tokuda, Galuteria Co-Chairs; Green. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Jordan Co-Chairs; Morikawa, McDermott. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 585) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3593) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Galuteria. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-16 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HOU/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3080) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Green, Harimoto, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Harimoto, Green, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Ihara, Slom. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-16 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HOU/HMS, WAM. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 129). |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 802-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2016-02-04 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 25-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-01 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Belatti, Creagan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-01-29 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-01-16 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2087 (Same As) 2016-02-04 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.