HI HB2265 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Re-referred to WAL/EEP, CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Re-referred to WAL/EEP, CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes and implements the Catastrophic Wildfire Securitization Act, to allow public utilities to securitize rates in order to raise capital that can be used to pay for costs and expenses arising out of catastrophic wildfires.
Title
Relating To Public Utilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | House | Re-referred to WAL/EEP, CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL/CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2922 (Same As) 2024-04-26 - Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 790).
Subjects
Catastrophic Wildfire Expenses
Electrical Corporations
Financing Orders
Public Utilities
Public Utilities Commission
Rate Securitization
Recovery Bonds
Recovery Property
Electrical Corporations
Financing Orders
Public Utilities
Public Utilities Commission
Rate Securitization
Recovery Bonds
Recovery Property
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2265&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2265_.HTM |