HI HB2300 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 681).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 681).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the University of Hawaii to submit a report to the Legislature within thirty days of certain appropriation transfers or changes between programs. Effective 7/1/2030. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 681). |
2018-04-26 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-25-18 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; Galuteria, S. Chang Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Cullen Co-Chairs; Hashem, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 697) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3605) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3009) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 1:18PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 327). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1036-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 624-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-08 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Kong, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Quinlan, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-08-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-18 2:00PM. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-06-18 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2862 (Same As) 2018-02-02 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.