HI HB2336 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds immunity from civil and criminal liability for individuals who provide information or assistance in child abuse investigations. Effective 12/31/2059. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Reports Of Child Abuse.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-16-20 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-06-20 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC/WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 218). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 882-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-12 | House | Re-referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2). |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 234-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2892 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 36