HI HB2365 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to HHS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to HHS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires criminal history checks of adult relatives who provide care for a child whose family receives a child care subsidy from the Department of Human Services, clarifies that the Department of Human Services may take both administrative and judicial action to enforce child care licensing provisions of chapter 346, Hawaii Revised Statutes, clarifies the role and response of the child care licensing program when it receives a report of death or injury of a child in a child care setting, and addresses the release of information pending an investigation.
Title
Relating To Child Care.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HHS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2792 (Same As) 2018-03-20 - Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 44
Subjects
Criminal History Checks
Improve Safety of Children in Care
Penalties, Administrative and judicial action
Records of Deficiencies and Complaints
Release of Information for Purposes of Investigation
Role and Response to Reports of Death or Injury in a Child Care Setting
Improve Safety of Children in Care
Penalties, Administrative and judicial action
Records of Deficiencies and Complaints
Release of Information for Purposes of Investigation
Role and Response to Reports of Death or Injury in a Child Care Setting
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2365&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2365_.HTM |