HI HB2375 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reinstates the Governor's authority to transfer funds to cope with the effects of natural disasters, for operating purposes, or to supplement the Department of Land and Natural Resources' Firefighter's Contingency Fund. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5). |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 416-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-09 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden. |
2024-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-09-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3064 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.