HI HB2426 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that DOE and athletic leagues and associations allow charter school students wishing to participate in a sport for which there is no program at the charter school in the service area where the student resides, to participate in a comparable DOE school sports program in the service area where the student resides or in an adjacent service area at no additional cost to the student. Specifies that charter school students be represented by the DOE school for athletic league or association business. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Athletics.
Sponsors
Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Dale Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 88). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 771-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 450-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Quinlan, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Morikawa. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 02-06-20 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |