HI HB2530 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 126, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 126, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals language that requires the department of human services to determine the amount of liability insurance coverage required to be obtained and maintained by child care providers. Repeals language that requires child care providers to disclose a summary of information that includes the insurer's name and contact information, coverage amounts, and effective dates for liability insurance coverage. Amends Act 161, Session Laws of Hawaii 2017, by extending the deadline for the department to submit a report to the legislature, amending the information to be included in the report, and extending the implementation and enforcement deadline until 7/1/2019. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Child Care.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Act 126, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227). |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Act 126, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227). |
2018-04-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 696). |
2018-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Thielen, Tupola excused (3). |
2018-04-27 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2018-04-26 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Takumi, Nishimoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 10:35AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-25-18 10:35AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 815). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Baker Co-Chair; S. Chang. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Takumi, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 740) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3551) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 03-28-18 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2991) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-18 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to HMS, CPH. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 349). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1078-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 431-18), recommending referral to JUD. |
2018-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, McDermott. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-12-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 176-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-30 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Friday, 02-02-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HHS, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2539 (Same As) 2018-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.