HI HB2557 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 2:40PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 2:40PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to support the internship and economic development programs of the Pacific International Space Center for Exploration Systems. Inserts a ceiling of $1,000,000 for the pacific international space center for exploration systems special fund. Takes effect on 7/1/2112. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Pacific International Space Center For Exploration Systems.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 2:40PM in conference room 423. |
2018-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-25-18 2:40PM in conference room 423. |
2018-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; K. Kahele, English Co-Chairs; Espero. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Evans, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 743) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3680) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3090) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-18 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Re-Referred to ETT, WAM. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to PSM/ETT, WAM. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 43). |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 772-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-16 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola. |
2018-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 259-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-02-18 8:45AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |