HI HB2610 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Re-Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Re-Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Disaster Relief Match Special Fund to support the local match requirements of the Federal Emergency Management Agency Maui Wildfires Hazard Mitigation Grant Program for projects that implement mitigation measures to prevent and minimize the impacts of natural hazards affecting the State. Appropriates moneys into the Disaster Relief Match Special Fund. Makes appropriations to support the State's continued response to the August 2023 wildfires that affected the counties of Hawaii and Maui. Declares that the appropriations exceed the state general fund expenditure ceiling for 2024-2025. Effective 7/1/2042. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Disaster Relief.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2024-04-05 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 483) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3421) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Lee, Wakai. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-24 10:01AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft). |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3092) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-24 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 160). |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 837-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-26-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5). |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from WAL/JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 425-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-12 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-12 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/JHA on Monday, 02-12-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Appropriations
Department of Defense
Disaster Relief Match Special Fund
FEMA
General Fund Expenditure Ceiling Exceeded ($)
Hazard Mitigation Grant Program
Maui Wildfires
Department of Defense
Disaster Relief Match Special Fund
FEMA
General Fund Expenditure Ceiling Exceeded ($)
Hazard Mitigation Grant Program
Maui Wildfires