HI HB2630 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kila, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Pierick, Ward voting no (9) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kila, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Pierick, Ward voting no (9) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes, and establishes a regulatory framework for, the administration of psilocybin for therapeutic use. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Mental Health Treatment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kila, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Pierick, Ward voting no (9) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 595-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-02-14 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam. |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-14-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Alcos, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Kila, Kitagawa, Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Pierick voting no (6) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4). |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported from JHA/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 208-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-02-06 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Marten, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garcia; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kobayashi; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-06 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA/HLT on Tuesday, 02-06-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA/HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3019 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to HHS/CPN, WAM/JDC.