HI HB2711 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the appropriations allocated to the workforce investment boards on the islands of Oahu, Maui, Kauai, and Hawaii; amends the appropriation to be used by the workforce development council; repeals the appropriation allocated to the department of labor and industrial relations for administrative expenses.
Title
Reed Act Funds; Workforce Investment Board; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 308-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-05 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Saiki, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Awana, Souki; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Pine. | |
2010-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-05-10 9:30 AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |