HI HB2711 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, Johanson, Marumoto, Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, Johanson, Marumoto, Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires contractors with public contracts: (1) to pay their employees wages that provide an annual income equal to the poverty guidelines for Hawaii published by the federal DHHS, or a greater amount; and (2) to allow their employees to have access to and join labor organizations. (HB2711 HD1)
Title
Public Works; Wages; Contractors; Public Contracts; Service Employees
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, Johanson, Marumoto, Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2). | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 371-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Souki, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine, Johanson; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki. | |
2012-01-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-03-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 8 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |