HI HB272 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes abusive conduct against a public employee a workplace safety and health violation.
Title
Abusive Work Environment; Public Employment
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4). |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 82), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-01-29 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-29-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |