HI HB383 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB383
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-03 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-03 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates articles I through IV of the Uniform Probate Code to adjust for inflation, provide additional clarity, resolve issues that have arisen in probate practice, and address societal changes in familial relations. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Uniform Probate Code.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima excused (2). |
2023-02-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 28) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-01-31 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 01-31-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB383 (Carry Over) 2023-02-03 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima excused (2).
SB483 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Act 158, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261).
SB483 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Act 158, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261).