HI HB389 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an environmental assessment for any development on lands with an average slope of 20% or greater.
Title
Environmental Impact Statements
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Lyla Berg [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Hermina Morita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-03 | (H) Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-05-09 9:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-05-09 9:00am in House conference room 312. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Re-referred to EEP, WLO, FIN, referral sheet 6 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to EEP, WLO, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=389&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB389_.HTM |