HI HB391 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Act 165, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Act 165, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows overtime compensation on public works projects to exceed time and one-half and specifies that if the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations determines that a prevailing wage is defined by collective bargaining, overtime will be at rates set by the applicable collective bargaining agreement. Specifies that overtime compensation and other premium pay rates are those rates specified in an applicable collective bargaining agreement when the basic hourly rate is established by a collective bargaining agreement. (HB391 CD1)
Title
Overtime Compensation; Public Works
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Act 165, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266). |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Act 165, 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Thielen, Tupola voting no (3) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 21 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 4 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere, Ruderman, Slom, L. Thielen. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 34). |
2015-04-30 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 34) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Tokuda, Ihara, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2015-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2015-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Gabbard, Ihara, Shimabukuro. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Aquino, McDermott. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 532) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kidani, Wakai . Noes, 4 (Senator(s) Riviere, Ruderman, Slom, L. Thielen). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1488) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Inouye, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto, Slom. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1142) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) L. Thielen; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-24-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 179). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Jordan, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 837) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-15 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto, Tokioka excused (3). |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 21), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-03 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-03-15 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB216 (Same As) 2015-03-12 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30