HI HB396 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB396
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows nonprofit organizations to establish an applicant governing board and develop a charter application for a start-up or conversion charter school; provided that the governing board operates separately from the nonprofit organization and the governing board may include members of the nonprofit organization, but such members shall not constitute a majority of the governing board's members. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 457) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-11 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ohno, Quinlan, Takayama. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-11-21 3:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB396 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).