HI HB5 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-18 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-18 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the department of health's emergency medical services and injury prevention system branch to establish and maintain a statewide fall prevention and early detection program and appropriates funds for the program.
Title
Kupuna Caucus; Department of Health; Statewide Fall Prevention and Early Detection Program; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB105 (Same As) 2013-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:30PM in conference room 229.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=5&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB5_.HTM |