HI HB535 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB535
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist Pearl Harbor Floating Drydock, LLC, for the construction of a purpose-built floating drydock at Pearl Harbor to service submarines and surface ships. (HB535 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Issuance Of Special Purpose Revenue Bonds To Assist Pearl Harbor Floating Drydock, Llc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 167) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Quinlan. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-01-19 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2019-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-19 10:00AM. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 01-30-19 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB535 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
SB985 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 045, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146).
SB985 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 045, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146).