HI HB548 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the University of Hawaii Board of Regents to perform a program evaluation every two years to consider whether the College of Pharmacy should be continued. (HB548 HD1)
Title
UH Hilo College of Pharmacy; Program Evaluation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 482) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-12 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Kong, LoPresti, Ohno, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Say. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-12-15 2:02PM in conference room 309. |
2015-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-15. |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 02-05-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |