HI HB562 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that HPHA is authorized to contract with private businesses to remove food and green waste from public housing projects. Effective July 1, 2100. (HB562 HD2)
Title
Hawaii Public Housing Authority; Waste Diversion
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Denny Coffman [D] |
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Jo Jordan [D] |
Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3). |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 382) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-02-11 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Jordan. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-11-13 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HSG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3). |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 222) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HSG. |
2013-02-05 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-05-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to EEP, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB721 (Same As) 2013-01-28 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.