HI HB562 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB562
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, CPC, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, CPC, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that a dentist who has not successfully completed the education specified for the dental specialty as defined by the American Dental Association may be subject to license suspension or revocation or a fine if the dentist uses words or phrases in advertising that are similar to the existing list of prohibited words or phrases. Expands the prohibited words or phrases to include "dentistry for children".
Title
Relating To Dentistry.
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB562 (Carry Over) 2017-01-25 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=562&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB562_.HTM |