HI HB585 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB585
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to HLT/IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to HLT/IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes biennial requirements of forty credit hours in specified continuing medical education programs for renewal of physician assistant licenses, beginning with the renewal for the licensing biennium on 2/1/2020, and every biennial renewal thereafter. Authorizes the Hawaii Medical Board to conduct random document audits to enforce compliance. Specifies conditions for forfeiture and reinstatement of a license.
Title
Relating To Physician Assistants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT/IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB585 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to HLT/IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
SB810 (Same As) 2019-02-04 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
SB810 (Same As) 2019-02-04 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=585&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB585_.HTM |