HI HB59 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-01 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-01 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers to provide employees with specific wage and employer information at the time of hiring and in employees' pay records. Increases civil and criminal penalties for employers' noncompliance with wage rate notice requirements. Require public notice of employer violations.
Title
Wages; Payment of Compensation; Penalties
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-01-13 10:45AM in conference room 309. |
2013-01-29 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-13. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-29-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB332 (Same As) 2013-05-01 - Act 070, 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1170).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=59&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB59_.HTM |