HI HB591 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 213, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1327).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 213, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1327).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes structures, machinery, equipment, and capital assets in the definition of capital infrastructure costs for the Capital Infrastructure Tax Credit. Sets cap on credit per taxable year per qualified infrastructure tenant including all partners and members of the qualified infrastructure tenant and its special purpose entities. Specifies that excess tax credits may be carried forward. Recaptures credit if qualified infrastructure tenant fails to relocate within a certain period of time after executing a lease with the Department of Transportation. Specifies taxpayer reporting requirements. Provides penalties for failure to report information. (HB591 CD1)
Title
Relating To The Capital Infrastructure Tax Credit.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 213, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1327). |
2017-07-13 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 213, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1327). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, Oshiro voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Taniguchi). Excused, 0 (none). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 189). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 189) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2017-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Luke; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2017-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 3:35PM in Conference Room 309. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 1:10PM in conference room 225. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 2:35PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 2:30PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-17 2:00PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; English. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Luke Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 591) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Taniguchi . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1470) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 988) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-17 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 120). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 897), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Choy, Tokioka; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kobayashi; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Tupola. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 430) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-10 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-10-17 9:00AM in conference room 309. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-17. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-31 | House | Re-referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |