HI HB595 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB595
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "electronic device" to clarify the scope of devices covered under the Electronic Device Recycling and Recovery Act. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Related To Recycling.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Rachele Fernandez Lamosao [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Jackson Sayama [D] | Rep. Jenna Takenouchi [D] | Rep. Elle Cochran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Kila, Todd excused (3). |
2023-02-06 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 52) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-01-31 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-31-23 8:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB793 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB595 (Carry Over) 2023-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Kila, Todd excused (3).
HB595 (Carry Over) 2023-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Kila, Todd excused (3).
Subjects
Electronic Device Recycling and Recovery Act
Electronic Devices
Electronic Manufacturing Recycling
Printers
Electronic Devices
Electronic Manufacturing Recycling
Printers
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=595&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB595_HD1_.HTM |