HI HB615 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 958).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Board of Education to invite the exclusive representative for Bargaining Unit (5) (teachers and other personnel of the Department of Education) to appoint a nonvoting public school teacher representative to the Board. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Board Of Education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 958).
2019-04-24SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Kanuha, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Woodson, C. Lee, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Gates, Okimoto.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 763) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Moriwaki, Riviere, L. Thielen. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-04SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1871) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 9:45AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-20SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-03-20SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1295) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-13SenateRe-Referred to EDU, JDC.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to EDU/LCA, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 393).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1220) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 747) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-14HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-13HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-13HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:01PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-01HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen, Todd, Tokioka excused (4).
2019-02-01HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-01-29HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-01-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 01-29-19 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-24HouseReferred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback