HI HB625 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires land and facilities under the jurisdiction of DOE not being used to be transferred to Department of Land and Natural Resources; provided that the land or facilities is first offered to, or used for charter schools, other educational purposes, or to an eligible county where the land or facility is situated. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB625 HD3)
Title
Education; Charter Schools; Counties; DLNR
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to EDU/WLH, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 142). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 753) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-11 12:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Chong, Nakashima excused. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 385) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Chong, Ito, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Herkes, Morita. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 02-11-11 8:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLO with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 87) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLO. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Takumi, Belatti, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Nishimoto, Saiki, Takai, Wooley, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Chang, Mizuno, Nakashima. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-02-11 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to EDN, WLO, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |